Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sinolfo di Castel Lotario

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Mar 1497AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
4 Jun 1497Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi, Italy
14 Jan 1503DiedBishop of Chiusi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sinolfo di Castel Lotario
Bishop Sinolfo di Castel Lotario (died ) Bishop of Chiusi

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 132
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,497, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast