Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Casanate

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1620BornNaples, Italy
12 Jun 167353.3Elevated to Cardinal
17 Jul 167353.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
2 Dec 167555.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
6 Apr 168262.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
16 Sep 168666.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
7 Nov 168969.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
3 Mar 170080.1DiedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Casanate:
Cardinal Girolamo Casanate (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

  • a cardinal for 26.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1673

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013