Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Casali

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1715BornRome, Italy
12 Dec 177055.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Mar 177357.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 177357.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
17 Feb 177761.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
14 Jan 178771.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres

MicroData Summary for Antonio Casali:
Antonio Cardinal Casali (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres

  • a cardinal for 16.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1770

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015