Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Carré, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orange, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1484AppointedBishop of Orange, France
1 Feb 1484Ordained BishopBishop of Orange, France
5 Jan 1510DiedBishop of Orange, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Carré
Bishop Pierre Carré O.P. (died ) Bishop of Orange

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 123
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,397
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 99
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast