Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Donald Martin Carroll

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Rockford, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1909Born
7 Apr 193424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
27 Jun 195646.5AppointedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
25 Sep 195646.8ResignedBishop-Elect of Rockford, Illinois, USA
3 Jan 200292.1DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Rockford, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Donald Martin Carroll
Father Donald Martin Carroll (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Rockford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL

  • a priest for 67.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast