Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo di Cariñena Ipenza y Saulini, O. de M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655²Born
5 Oct 169944.7AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
22 Nov 169944.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
25 Dec 172267.9DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo di Cariñena Ipenza y Saulini
Archbishop Bernardo di Cariñena Ipenza y Saulini O. de M. (born 1655, died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasbas

  • a bishop for 23.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 136
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 242, Number 1,496
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast