Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrique Cardinal de Cardona y Enríquez

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1485²BornUrgel
18 Apr 150520.3AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
23 Jan 151227.1AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
21 Nov 152742.9Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 152742.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
7 Feb 153045.1DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrique de Cardona y Enríquez:
Cardinal Enrique de Cardona y Enríquez (died ) Archbishop of Monreale

  • a cardinal for 2.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Nov 1527
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 22, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 129, and Page 250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013