Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Kazimierz Charbicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Epiro


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1657AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
19 Jan 1657AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Epiro
8 Jun 1663DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Stefan Kazimierz Charbicki (VIAF: 161162622)
Bishop Stefan Kazimierz Charbicki (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 259
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1657, Number 24
  • nm/d: CB, 25 Jan 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast