Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Carandini

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1729Born
29 Jan 178757.3Elevated to Cardinal
23 Apr 178757.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
12 Sep 179465.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
28 Apr 181080.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

MicroData Summary for Filippo Carandini
Filippo Cardinal Carandini (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

EventPlace
Birth PlacePesaro, Italy

  • a cardinal for 23.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Jan 1787

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast