Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placido Carafa, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹Born
6 Jul 163217.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
26 Mar 166247.2SelectedBishop of Acerra, Italy
9 Apr 166348.2ConfirmedBishop of Acerra, Italy
15 Apr 166348.2Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
3 Dec 167257.9DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Placido Carafa
Bishop Placido Carafa C.R. (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Acerra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSant’Andrea della Valle, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 66
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 23
  • b/c2: AT, 7 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Nov 2018

Quantcast