Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Corrado Cardinal Caracciolo

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

Administrator of Orvieto


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jun 1395AppointedArchbishop of Nicosia, Cyprus
2 Oct 1402AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mileto, Italy
12 Jun 1405Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 1405AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
1409²AppointedAdministrator of Orvieto, Italy
15 Feb 1411DiedAdministrator of Orvieto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Corrado Caracciolo:
Cardinal Corrado Caracciolo (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

  • a cardinal for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013