Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cornelio Cardinal Caprara

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1703Born
23 Nov 176158.8Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jan 176259.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
14 Nov 176259.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Apr 176562.2DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

MicroData Summary for Cornelio Caprara
Cornelio Cardinal Caprara (born 1703, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Nov 1761

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast