Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Canepa

Deceased

Bishop of Nicopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1713BornCornice
1 Jun 176754.2AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
26 Jun 176855.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
Feb 1769³55.8DiedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Canepa:
Bishop Sebastiano Canepa (born , died Feb 1769) Bishop of Nicopoli

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,134
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015