Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchor Cano, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1509²Born
12 Sep 155243.6AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
30 Jul 155344.5Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
1554¹45.0ResignedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
30 Sep 156051.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melchor Cano (VIAF: 59102478)
Bishop Melchor Cano O.P. (born 1509, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarancón, Diocese of Cuenca
Ordained BishopSegovia, Diocese of Segovia
Death PlaceSan Pedro Martir, Convent, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 150
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 64, Number 369
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1553, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast