Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Campeggi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia in Orphea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1504Born
19 Mar 152621.9AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
31 Jul 154137.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 154137.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bologna, Italy
20 Nov 155147.6Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155147.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia in Orphea
6 Mar 155348.9ResignedBishop of Bologna, Italy
21 Sep 155450.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Campeggi (VIAF: 173503617)
Alessandro Cardinal Campeggi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopSan Michele, Church, Bosco, Diocese of Bologna
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Father's Tomb, S. Maria in Trastevere, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 13.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
  • a cardinal for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,808
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • ob/c23: CB, 7 Jan 2014
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,012
  • b/c+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast