Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pascal Campana, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect of Lower Congo {Congo Inferiore}

Priest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1849BornCampana, France
28 Oct 188132.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
27 Aug 188233.6Solemn ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
11 Dec 188738.9AppointedPrefect of Lower Congo {Congo Inferiore}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Dec 190152.9DiedPrefect of Lower Congo {Congo Inferiore}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Pascal Campana:
Father Pascal Campana C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prefect of Lower Congo {Congo Inferiore}

  • a priest for 20.1 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015