Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Camaiani

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Feb 1552AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
7 Oct 1566AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
27 Jul 1579DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Camaiani
Bishop Pietro Camaiani (died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 196, and Page 119
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,552, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast