Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Calvi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1341²Born
10 Oct 139049.7AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
Jun 1391³50.4Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
22 Dec 139554.9AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
12 Jun 140564.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
2 Jul 140968.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
2 Oct 141170.7DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marco

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Calvi
Antonio Cardinal Calvi (born 1341, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 20.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018