Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Muzio Calini

Deceased

Bishop of Terni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1525¹Born
17 Jul 155530.5AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
12 Jul 156641.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Terni, Italy
22 Apr 157045.3DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Muzio Calini
Archbishop Muzio Calini (born 1525, died ) Bishop of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia
Death PlaceTerni, Diocese of Terni

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 213, and Page 215
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,555, Number 13*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast