Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Clément Cailleau, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Tambacounda, Senegal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1923Born
194723.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
1 Oct 195027.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
13 Aug 197047.0AppointedPrefect of Tambacounda, Senegal
6 Dec 197047.3InstalledPrefect of Tambacounda, Senegal
24 Apr 198662.7ResignedPrefect of Tambacounda, Senegal
21 Jul 201187.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of Tambacounda, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Clément Cailleau
Father Clément Cailleau C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Tambacounda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNueil-sur-Layon, France

  • a priest for 60.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 25 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast