Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ottavio Cardinal Cagiano de Azevedo

Deceased

Chancellor of the Apostolic Chancery

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1845BornFrosinone
Sep 1868³22.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
11 Dec 190560.0Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 190560.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
12 Jun 191367.5AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
31 Oct 191367.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
6 Dec 191570.0AppointedChancellor of the Apostolic Chancery
6 Dec 191570.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
11 Jul 192781.6DiedChancellor of the Apostolic Chancery

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Cagiano de Azevedo:
Ottavio Cardinal Cagiano de Azevedo (born , died ) Chancellor of Apostolic Chancery

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a cardinal for 21.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014