Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Caetani (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1360¹Born
27 Jan 139535.0AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
2 Feb 140242.0ResignedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
27 Feb 140242.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
27 Feb 140242.1Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 140545.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
2 Jul 140949.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
2 Jul 140949.5AppointedAdministrator of Fiesole, Italy
1411²51.0ResignedAdministrator of Fiesole, Italy
11 Jan 141252.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Caetani (Sr.)
Antonio Cardinal Caetani (Sr.) (born 1360, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 9.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Feb 1402

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018