Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Paolo Caccia

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598¹BornColle Veteri
1 Sep 164749.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 164850.3AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
1 Jun 164850.4Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
6 Sep 1649³51.6DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Caccia:
Bishop Giovanni Paolo Caccia (died ) Bishop of Marsi

  • a priest for 2.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,422
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015