Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Nivardo Maria (Francesco) Buttarazzi, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot of Order of Cistercians

Titular See: (Casamari)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1907Born
19 Mar 192416.7ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
3 Jul 193225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
4 Oct 194134.3AppointedAbbot of Order of Cistercians
1988¹80.5DiedAbbot of Order of Cistercians

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nivardo Maria (Francesco) Buttarazzi (VIAF: 88729317)
Abbot Nivardo Maria (Francesco) Buttarazzi O. Cist. (born , died 1988) Abbot of Order of Cistercians

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte San Giovanni Campano, Italy

  • a priest for 55.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 15 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017