Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmund Butler, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Oct 1524AppointedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
3 Jan 1525Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
5 Mar 1551DiedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Edmund Butler
Archbishop Edmund Butler O.SS.T. (died ) Archbishop of Cashel

  • a bishop for 26.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 156
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,208
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1524, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast