Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Andrea de Bussi (Bossi)

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Mar 1463AppointedBishop of Acci (Accia), France
23 Jul 1466AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
4 Feb 1475DiedBishop of Aleria, France

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea de Bussi (Bossi):
Bishop Giovanni Andrea de Bussi (Bossi) (died ) Bishop of Aleria

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 78, and Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013