Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Dariusz Buras

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Atyrau, Kazakhstan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1971 Born
30 May 199826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
16 May 201543.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Atyrau, Kazakhstan
8 Dec 202049.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Atyrau, Kazakhstan

MicroData Summary for Dariusz Buras (VIAF: 303044967)
Father Dariusz Buras (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Atyrau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSkrzyszów

Please contact the Father through the Apostolic Administration of Atyrau.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 May 2015
  • c1: CB, 1 Mar 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 8 Dec 2020

Quantcast