Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Buonaccorso Cardinal Buonacorsi

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620Born
29 Nov 166949.9Elevated to Cardinal
19 May 167050.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
18 Apr 167858.2DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

MicroData Summary for Buonaccorso Buonacorsi
Buonaccorso Cardinal Buonacorsi (born 1620, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontesanto, Italy

  • a cardinal for 8.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1669

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast