Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Józef Bukaty

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

Titular Bishop of Thespiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1740BornKomaryszki
11 Aug 176525.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Aug 176525.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 178645.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
24 Jul 178645.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thespiae
12 May 179655.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Józef Bukaty:
Bishop Tadeusz Józef Bukaty (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 30.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 403, and Page 454
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016