Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Buccarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Nola, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1458AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy
9 Aug 1469AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
1 Jun 1475³DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Buccarelli
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Buccarelli (died ) Bishop of Nola

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 96, and Page 204
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1458, Number 41*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast