Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lamprecht von Brunn

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1325¹Born
14 Feb 136439.1AppointedBishop of Speyer, Germany
28 Apr 137146.3AppointedBishop of Strasbourg, France
28 Apr 137449.3AppointedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
13 Jan 139974.0ResignedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
17 Jul 139974.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lamprecht von Brunn (VIAF: 57525294)
Bishop Lamprecht von Brunn (born 1325, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 460, and Page 105
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast