Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Bruce

Deceased

Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Feb 1441AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
4 Feb 1442Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
3 Feb 1447AppointedBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Bruce
Bishop James Bruce , Bishop of Glasgow

EventPlace
Ordained BishopDunfermline
Death PlaceEdinburgh

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 160, and Page 147
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,001
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 7,971

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast