Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basilio Brollo, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1648Born
167021.7ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
1674²25.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
25 Oct 169648.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China
16 Nov 170456.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basilio Brollo (VIAF: 61957240)
Bishop Basilio Brollo O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGemona, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained PriestVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Death PlaceSanyŁan

  • a priest for 30.8 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast