Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Briçonnet

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Malo, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1479Born
151233.0AppointedBishop of Toulon, France
151233.0Ordained BishopBishop of Toulon, France
18 Apr 151334.2AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
23 Sep 151940.7AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
1520¹41.0ResignedBishop of Lodève, France
15 Dec 153556.9DiedBishop of Saint-Malo, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis Briçonnet (VIAF: 305274391)
Bishop Denis Briçonnet (born 1479, died ) Bishop of Saint-Malo

  • a bishop for 23.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast