Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim Bredow, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brandenburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1483ProfessedMember of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
1485SelectedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
14 Oct 1485ConfirmedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
16 Apr 1486Ordained BishopBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
22 May 1507DiedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joachim Bredow (VIAF: 40596758)
Bishop Joachim Bredow O. Praem. (died ) Bishop of Brandenburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBrandenburg, Diocese of Brandenburg

  • a bishop for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,406
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 110
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 139
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,486, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast