Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert de Brécourt

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Oct 1340AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
12 Nov 1340Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
24 Jan 1375DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Robert de Brécourt
Bishop Robert de Brécourt (died ) Bishop of Evreux

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 234
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast