Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Henri de Bruyère de Chalabre

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1731¹BornCastelnaudary
26 Dec 176938.9SelectedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
12 Mar 177039.1ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
22 Apr 177039.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
1795¹64.0DiedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Henri de Bruyère de Chalabre:
Bishop Louis-Henri de Bruyère de Chalabre (born 1731, died 1795) Bishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières

  • a bishop for 24.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 343
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015