Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Otto von Braunschweig-Lüneburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1364¹Born
5 May 138925.3AppointedBishop of Verden, Germany
2 Oct 139531.7AppointedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
30 Jun 140642.4DiedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Otto von Braunschweig-Lüneburg (VIAF: 164157764)
Archbishop Otto von Braunschweig-Lüneburg (born 1364, died ) Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 146, and Page 521

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 4 Feb 2016