Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Brancaccio

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹Born
16 Oct 165635.7AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
19 Aug 166948.6AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
29 Apr 167756.3DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Brancaccio
Bishop Tommaso Brancaccio (born 1621, died ) Bishop of Nard˛

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUgento

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 286
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 105
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1656, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast