Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodor (Johann Karl) von Brabeck, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Corvey, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1738³Born
175617.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Sep 175921.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Sep 176224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Jun 179253.9AppointedBishop of Corvey, Germany
1 Jun 179455.8Ordained BishopBishop of Corvey, Germany
25 Oct 179456.2DiedBishop of Corvey, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Theodor (Johann Karl) von Brabeck
Bishop Theodor (Johann Karl) von Brabeck O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Corvey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNordherrungen
Death PlaceCorvey, Diocese of Corvey

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for .3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,792, Number 87
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 181
  • ob: CB, 22 Dec 2019
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast