Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Tomás Cardinal de Boxadors y Sureda de San Martín, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1703Born
173430.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
175652.7AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Nov 177572.6Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 177572.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
177773.7ResignedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Dec 178077.7DiedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto

MicroData Summary for Juan Tomás de Boxadors y Sureda de San Martín (VIAF: 90630963)
Juan Tomás Cardinal de Boxadors y Sureda de San Martín O.P. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Spain

  • a cardinal for 5.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Nov 1775

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast