Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Carlo Bovio

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1522Born
10 Dec 154624.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ostuni, Italy
1550¹27.9SucceededBishop of Ostuni, Italy
27 Mar 155836.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ostuni, Italy
21 Jun 156442.4AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
Sep 1570³48.6DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carlo Bovio (VIAF: 15123238)
Archbishop Giovanni Carlo Bovio (born , died Sep 1570) Archbishop of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrindisi, Archdiocese of Brindisi
Ordained BishopOstuni, Diocese of Ostuni

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 142
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1546, Number 30*
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1558, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast