Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Bose

Deceased

Bishop of Merseburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Apr 1431SelectedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
23 May 1431ConfirmedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
5 Aug 1431Ordained BishopBishop of Merseburg, Germany
3 Oct 1463DiedBishop of Merseburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Bose
Bishop Johann von Bose (died ) Bishop of Merseburg

  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 336
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast