Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Simone Cardinal Brossano

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1310²Born
18 Jun 137161.5AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
20 Dec 137566.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
20 Dec 137566.0Elevated to Cardinal
27 Aug 138171.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simone Brossano:
Cardinal Simone Brossano (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

  • a cardinal for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 333
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013