Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Giambattista Bonesana, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Como


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1649BornMilano
24 Sep 167223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
24 Mar 169242.8AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
7 Apr 169242.8Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
14 Nov 169546.4AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
21 Dec 170960.5DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giambattista Bonesana:
Bishop Francesco Giambattista Bonesana C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Como

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 134, and Page 166
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015