Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Bonemilch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Dec 1497AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
4 Dec 1497AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
13 Dec 1497Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
Apr 1508ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
17 Oct 1510DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Bonemilch:
Bishop Johannes Bonemilch (died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

  • a bishop for 12.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 236
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,942

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013