Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simone Bonadies

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Sep 1488AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
10 Feb 1511AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
18 Jan 1518DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simone Bonadies:
Bishop Simone Bonadies (died ) Bishop of Rimini

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 118, and Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013