Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Cardinal Bolognetti

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1690BornRome, Italy
9 Sep 174353.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174353.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
13 Dec 174353.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Dec 174353.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 174757.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
1 Feb 175161.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
22 Feb 175666.1DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres

MicroData Summary for Mario Bolognetti:
Mario Cardinal Bolognetti (born 1690, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres

  • a priest for 12.1 years
  • a cardinal for 12.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015