Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christian von Weisenau (Bolanden)

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1179¹Born
29 Jun 124970.4AppointedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
Jul 1249²70.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
21 Nov 125172.8DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christian von Weisenau (Bolanden) (VIAF: 37283287)
Archbishop Christian von Weisenau (Bolanden) (born 1179, died ) Archbishop of Mainz

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 321
  • ob/c2: ATh, 11 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,645

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast