Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Albert (the Great) von Bollstädt, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1193¹Born
1223²30.0EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Jan 126067.0AppointedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
Feb 1262³69.0ResignedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
15 Nov 128087.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Regensburg, Germany
1622²Beatified
16 Dec 1931Canonized

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Albert (the Great) von Bollstädt
Bishop St. Albert (the Great) von Bollstädt O.P. (born 1193, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLauingen
Death PlaceKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 413
  • b: CB, 24 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast